Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Carroll County - Gaming
Sponsored by
Carroll County Delegation
Status
In the House - Recommitted to Ways and Means (Delegate Luedtke)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing specified organizations in Carroll County to conduct a card game, card tournament, or casino night under specified circumstances; requiring an organization to obtain a permit from the Board of License Commissioners for Carroll County before conducting a card game, card tournament, or casino night; requiring an organization that seeks a permit to meet specified requirements; specifying that a card game, card tournament, or casino night may be managed and organized by specified organizations; providing a contingency; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0037
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0310 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {465767/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Recommitted to Ways and Means (Delegate Luedtke)
Proceedings
49
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/14/2014 1/15/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2014 3/14/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Favorable with Amendments {465767/1 Report Adopted 47
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
House 3/17/2014 3/13/2014 Recommitted to Ways and Means (Delegate Luedtke) 49
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-906, 13-906.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM