Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Handgun Locking Devices - Repeal Exclusivity of Internal Locks - Requirements for External or Internal Lock System
Sponsored by
Delegates Vitale, Ghrist, Glass, S. Howard, McKay, Metzgar, Saab, Szeliga, and B. Wilson
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the sale, offer for sale, rental, or transfer in the State of a handgun that is sold, offered for sale, rented, or transferred with an external safety lock as an alternative to an integrated mechanical safety device.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0713 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2015
Legislative Date
1/28/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2015 1/28/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM