Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment – Wetlands and Waterways – Riparian Rights
Sponsored by
Delegate Bagnall
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Specifying that the riparian rights of a community association or other entity may not be terminated or impaired as a result of erosion, sea level rise, or the issuance of certain approvals by a county, the Department of the Environment, or the Board of Public Works; requiring the Department to establish and maintain on the Department's website a publicly accessible repository to keep record of community associations or other entities that possess riparian rights; and applying the Act.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/09/2020
Legislative Date
10/09/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Environment – Wetlands and Waterways – Riparian Rights
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/09/2020 10/09/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Environment – Wetlands and Waterways – Riparian Rights
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-201.1 )
Last Updated: 1/11/2021 4:50 PM