Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
County Property Taxes - Classes of Property - Special Rates and Limits
Sponsored by
Delegate Carr
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City or the governing body of a county to impose property tax on those classes of property that it selects to be subject to property tax or set special rates for specified classes of property; authorizing the governing body of a county to set a higher property tax rate or collect more property tax revenues than are authorized under the county's charter; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2013; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1472 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2013 1/18/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-202, 6-203, 6-302 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM