Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration)
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing specified funds to be used for specified purposes; authorizing or altering the distribution of specified revenues; altering or repealing specified required appropriations; altering the rate of specified commissions; providing for the transfer of specified funds; altering the rate of a specified assessment; requiring the Health Services Cost Review Commission to establish a Community Partnership Assistance Program; setting limits in increases in payments to specified providers for a specified fiscal year; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0172
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014, July 1, 2014, October 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2014 1/15/2014 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-523, 5-1204 )
(   16-305, 17-104 )
(   19-214, 19-219.1 )
(   9-117, 9-20B-05 )
(   2-1302.1 )
(   13-209 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM