Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Vitale, Ghrist, Glass, McComas, McConkey, McMillan, Metzgar, Saab, and B. Wilson
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an official publisher that publishes legal material in an electronic record to designate the electronic record as official, under specified circumstances, and authenticate the electronic record in a specified manner; providing that specified legal material in an electronic record is presumed to be an accurate copy of the legal material; requiring an official publisher of specified legal material in an electronic record to provide for the preservation and security of the record; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0611
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0046 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2015
Legislative Date
1/28/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2015 1/28/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-1601 through 10-1611 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM