Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2018, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2007, 2010, 2011, 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, and 2017
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration)
Status
In the House - First Reading Appropriations
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt in the amount of $1,000,179,000, the proceeds to be used for certain necessary building, construction, demolition, planning, renovation, conversion, replacement, and capital equipment purchases of the State, for acquiring certain real estate in connection therewith, and for grants to certain subdivisions and other organizations for certain development and improvement purposes, subject to certain requirements; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0186
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018, June 1, 2019, June 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2007, 2010, 2011, 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, 2017 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM