Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation - Potomac River Bridges Towing Compact - Inclusion of Additional Bridges
Sponsored by
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee (By Request - Departmental - Transportation)
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 89
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Including the Governor Harry W. Nice/Senator Thomas "Mac" Middleton Bridge, Sandy Hook Bridge, Brunswick Bridge, and Point of Rocks Bridge as subject to the provisions of the Potomac River Bridges Towing Compact; and making the Act subject to certain contingencies.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
Contingency - on adoption of an interstate compact
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {520314/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 89
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Transportation - Potomac River Bridges Towing Compact - Inclusion of Additional Bridges
House 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/09/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable with Amendments {520314/1 Adopted 43AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2020 3/06/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Transportation - Potomac River Bridges Towing Compact - Inclusion of Additional Bridges
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Referred Rules 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Rereferred to Finance
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Second Reading Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Returned Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 89
Text - Chapter - Transportation - Potomac River Bridges Towing Compact - Inclusion of Additional Bridges
(   25-301 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:37 PM
Click to return on the top page