Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Elections - Membership - Appointments
Sponsored by
Delegate Ivey
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the authority of the Governor to appoint and remove members of the State Board of Elections; requiring that the members of the State Board be appointed jointly by the President of the Senate and Speaker of the House; and authorizing the President and Speaker to remove members of the State Board under certain circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/07/2020
Legislative Date
8/07/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Board of Elections - Membership - Appointments
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 8/07/2020 8/07/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - State Board of Elections - Membership - Appointments
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/15/2021 10:46 AM