Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Assembly - Limitation of Terms
Sponsored by
Delegates Hough, Afzali, Arentz, Frank, George, Glass, Jacobs, Krebs, McComas, McDermott, McMillan, Norman, Otto, Parrott, Schuh, Schulz, and Szeliga
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to impose a limit of three consecutive terms that a person may serve in the office of Senator or Delegate in the General Assembly; making stylistic changes; and submitting the amendment to the qualified voters of the State for their adoption or rejection.
Details
Constitutional Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Contingency - on a referendum
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 4:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2014
Legislative Date
2/20/2014
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/14/2014 1/15/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 2/24 at 4:00 p.m.
House 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/20/2014 2/20/2014 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page