Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Estate Tax – Unified Credit
Sponsored by
Delegate Wilkins
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering a certain limit on the unified credit used for determining the Maryland estate tax for decedents dying on or after July 1, 2021, to not exceed $1,000,000; and altering a certain limitation on the amount of the Maryland estate tax for decedents dying on or after July 1, 2021, to not exceed $1,000,000.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0256 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/12/2020
Legislative Date
10/12/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Estate Tax – Unified Credit
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/12/2020 10/12/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing canceled
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Estate Tax – Unified Credit
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/11/2021 4:50 PM