Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Maryland Seal of Biliteracy Act - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegates Gutierrez, Barkley, B. Barnes, Campos, Carr, Carter, Clippinger, Cullison, Dumais, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gilchrist, C. Howard, Jalisi, Kelly, Korman, Kramer, Luedtke, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Reznik, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Smith, Tarlau, Valderrama, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Seal of Biliteracy Program; providing for the purpose of the Program; providing that participation in the Program by a local school system is voluntary; providing that, beginning with the graduating class of 2016, specified eligible students shall receive the Maryland Seal of Biliteracy affixed to a diploma or transcript under specified circumstances; requiring the State Board of Education to establish specified criteria and requirements on or before October 1, 2015; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0310
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2015
Legislative Date
1/29/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2015
Legislative Date
1/30/2015
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2015 1/29/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/30/2015 1/30/2015 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-208 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM