Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Out-of-State Sex Offenders
Sponsored by
Delegates Valentino-Smith, Cluster, Sanchez, Smith, and B. Wilson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 616
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a District Court commissioner from authorizing the pretrial release of a defendant who is a sex offender who is required to register by another jurisdiction, a federal, military, or tribal court, or a foreign government.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {952219/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
71
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 616
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2016 1/21/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/21/2016 1/21/2016 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/26/2016 2/29/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments {952219/1 Report Adopted 35
House 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
House 3/03/2016 3/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 37
Senate 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 37
Senate 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/06/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 61A
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Second Reading Passed 61A
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 67
House 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Returned Passed 71
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 616
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM