Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Counties and Municipalities - At-Will Supervisory Employees - Residency Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates McCray, Anderton, Barron, Cassilly, Hayes, Knotts, Moon, Stein, and Wivell
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 776
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a county or municipality to require a specified at-will supervisory employee to reside in the State, county, or municipality or within a certain distance of the State, county, or municipality as a condition of employment under specified circumstances; providing that a local law, ordinance, or policy enacted or adopted under the Act shall apply only prospectively; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {454569/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (118-18)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 776
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Counties and Municipalities - At-Will Supervisory Employees - Residency Requirements
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Favorable with Amendments {454569/1 Adopted 30
House 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
Text - Third - Counties and Municipalities - At-Will Supervisory Employees - Residency Requirements
House 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (118-18) 32
Senate 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Referred Finance 31
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/31/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted 56
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Second Reading Passed 56
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 57
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 776
Text - Chapter - Counties and Municipalities - At-Will Supervisory Employees - Residency Requirements
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM