Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Boards, Commissions, and Councils - Member Removal
Sponsored by
Delegates Schulz, Afzali, Arentz, Aumann, Bates, Eckardt, Frank, George, Glass, Haddaway-Riccio, Hogan, Jacobs, Kramer, Krebs, Love, W. Miller, Minnick, Myers, Norman, O'Donnell, Olszewski, Otto, Schuh, Stifler, Szeliga, Vaughn, and Weir
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 588
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that a member of a specified board, commission, or council under the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation shall be considered to have resigned if the member does not attend at least two-thirds of the meetings during any consecutive 12-month period while the member was serving, subject to a specified exception; requiring specified notice to be provided to the Governor; requiring the Governor to appoint a successor under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/21/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-0)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {864934/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 588
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/14/2014 1/15/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/15/2014 1/15/2014 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/17/2014 2/18/2014 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 31
House 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Second Reading Passed 31
House 2/21/2014 2/21/2014 Third Reading Passed (129-0) 33
Senate 2/24/2014 2/24/2014 First Reading Finance 32
Senate 2/27/2014 2/27/2014 Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance 35
Senate 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Senate 4/02/2014 4/03/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable with Amendments {864934/1 Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) 62
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 House Concur - Senate Amendments 68
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 68
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Passed Enrolled 68
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 588
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-202, 12-202, 14-202, 15-202, 16-202, 17-202, 21-202, 2-202, 3-202, 4-202, 5-202, 6.5-202, 6-202, 7-202, 8-202, 9-202 )
(   11-202, 3-304, 4-202, 7-202, 8-202, 9A-202 )
(   11-403, 11-505, 11-901 )
(   12-820, 12-904 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM