Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Assembly - Fiscal Notes - Criminal Justice Policy Impact Statements
Sponsored by
Delegates Valentino-Smith, Moon, Patterson, B. Robinson, Smith, Sydnor, A. Washington, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a fiscal note for a bill to include a criminal justice policy impact statement if the bill creates a criminal offense, significantly alters the elements of an existing criminal offense, alters the penalties applicable to a criminal offense, or changes existing sentencing, parole, or probation procedures; requiring the Department of Legislative Services to prepare the criminal justice policy impact statement by requesting information from specified entities; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0576
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0678 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2016 1/21/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM