Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Rollback of Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act Conforming Provisions
Sponsored by
Delegates Hough, Afzali, Arentz, Aumann, Bates, Frank, George, Glass, Jacobs, Kipke, Krebs, McComas, McDermott, McDonough, Norman, Parrott, Ready, and Szeliga
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the application to specified coverage in specified insurance markets of specified provisions of the federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act relating to annual limitations on cost sharing and deductibles, child-only plan offerings, minimum benefit requirements for catastrophic plans, health insurance premium rates, coverage for individuals participating in approved clinical trials, and contract requirements for specified dental plans; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 12:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/14/2014 1/15/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/07 at 12:30 p.m.
House 4/02/2014 4/03/2014 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-1005, 15-1105, 15-1201, 15-1203, 15-1205, 15-1206, 15-1207, 15-1208.1, 15-1208.2, 15-1209, 15-1213, 15-1301, 15-1302, 15-1309, 15-1315, 15-1316, 15-137.1, 15-1410, 15-418, 15-508, 15-508.1, 15-509, 15-605, 31-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM