Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Family Law Services for Sustained Safety Fund
Sponsored by
Delegates Lierman, Boyce, Dumais, Ebersole, R. Lewis, and Rosenberg
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing the Family Law Services for Sustained Safety Fund to increase legal services in family law cases for victims in order to help ensure safety and long-term stability after victimization; requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to administer the Fund; requiring each grantee from the Fund to receive training on the effects of domestic violence, sexual assault, child abuse, and elder abuse; prohibiting a grantee from requesting an individual to waive certain rights in order to receive services; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0581
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Family Law Services for Sustained Safety Fund
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2020
Legislative Date
1/16/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
Reassigned to Judiciary
Proceedings
9 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2020
Legislative Date
2/13/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Family Law Services for Sustained Safety Fund
House 1/16/2020 1/16/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 Reassigned to Judiciary 9 Click to view Recorded Media
House 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/13/2020 2/13/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:38 PM
Click to return on the top page