Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Organ Donation - Presumed Consent (Patricia Hanberry Gift of Life Act)
Sponsored by
Delegate Clagett
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to notify an applicant for a driver's license or identification card that the applicant shall be deemed to have consented to be an organ donor unless the applicant expressly chooses not to consent; requiring the Administration to provide for a method by which the applicant can designate that the applicant does not consent to being an organ donor; and requiring the Administration to indicate whether an individual is an organ donor on the individual's driver's license or identification card.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0040
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2013 1/18/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/31/2013 1/31/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/15/2013 2/18/2013 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-303 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM