Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Judgments - Appeals - Supersedeas Bond
Sponsored by
Delegate Dumais
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Reducing the amount of a supersedeas bond required from specified appellants to stay the enforcement of a judgment in a civil action; and applying the Act prospectively.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0231
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
32
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2016 1/21/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/21/2016 1/21/2016 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/21/2016 1/21/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 1/21/2016 1/21/2016 Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
House 2/19/2016 2/22/2016 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 30
House 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Second Reading Passed 30
House 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 32
Senate 2/26/2016 2/26/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 32
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM