Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - Baltimore Region - Baltimore Metropolitan Council and Advisory Board and Baltimore Region Transportation Board
Sponsored by
Delegates Mitchell, Lafferty, Guzzone, Anderson, Clippinger, Glenn, Hammen, Hogan, Jones, Kach, Malone, McIntosh, Niemann, Norman, O'Donnell, Olszewski, Pena-Melnyk, Rosenberg, Stein, M. Washington, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 520
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Altering the purposes of the Baltimore Metropolitan Council; altering the membership of the Council; requiring the Council to make a specified report annually to the General Assembly; repealing provisions of law that establish the Baltimore Metropolitan Council Advisory Board; establishing the Baltimore Region Transportation Board; providing for the purpose and composition of the Board; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0547
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {430510/3 Report Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
2/28/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 520
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/14/2014 1/15/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 1/16/2014 1/16/2014 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/24/2014 2/24/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 Favorable with Amendments {430510/3 Report Adopted 35
House 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
House 2/27/2014 2/27/2014 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 37
Senate 2/28/2014 2/28/2014 First Reading Finance 36
Senate 3/11/2014 3/11/2014 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/24/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/25/2014 3/18/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 52
Senate 3/25/2014 3/18/2014 Second Reading Passed 52
Senate 3/26/2014 3/19/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 53
House 3/26/2014 3/21/2014 Returned Passed 57
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 520
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-301, 13-302, 13-303, 13-304, 13-305, 13-306, 13-307, 13-308, 13-309 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM