Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Community Colleges - State Funding - Revision
Sponsored by
Delegates Feldmark, Ebersole, Kerr, Hill, and Hornberger
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Specifying that a certain appropriation calculated under the Senator John A. Cade Funding Formula and a certain appropriation for Baltimore City Community College include appropriations, regardless of where they are budgeted, designated for the general operation of 4-year public institutions of higher education in the State, including personnel-related appropriations.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0433
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0423 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/29/2020
Legislative Date
10/29/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Community Colleges - State Funding - Revision
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2021
Legislative Date
1/11/2021
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/29/2020 10/29/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Community Colleges - State Funding - Revision
House 1/11/2021 1/11/2021 Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/20/2021 8:36 AM