Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commission on the Solemn Remembrance of the Victims of Lynching
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, Angel, Barron, Hayes, Hill, Morhaim, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, and Sample-Hughes
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Commission on the Solemn Remembrance of the Victims of Lynching; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Commission; requiring the Commission to study and make recommendations regarding the construction of appropriate markers or memorials in solemn remembrance of the victims of lynching in the State; requiring the Commission to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2016; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2016 1/21/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2016 3/15/2016 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM