Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance Violations - Injunctive Relief
Sponsored by
Delegate West
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the chairman or vice chairman of the State Board of Elections to seek an injunction against a violation of the campaign finance laws; repealing the authority of the Secretary of State to seek an injunction against a violation of the campaign finance laws; authorizing a candidate to seek an immediate injunction against violations of the campaign finance laws by specified persons; and providing a penalty for violation of the Act of a maximum fine of $250 or imprisonment not to exceed 30 days or both.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1265 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2016 1/21/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/19/2016 2/22/2016 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-605 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM