Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Utilities – Investor–Owned Utilities – Prevailing Wage
Sponsored by
Delegate Brooks
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring certain investor-owned gas, electric, or combination gas and electric companies to require certain contractors and subcontractors to pay their employees not less than the prevailing wage rate for certain projects involving the construction, reconstruction, installation, demolition, restoration, or alteration of any underground gas or electric infrastructure of the company, and any related traffic control activities.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0095
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1048 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/14/2020
Legislative Date
10/14/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Utilities – Investor–Owned Utilities – Prevailing Wage
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2021
Legislative Date
1/12/2021
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/14/2020 10/14/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Public Utilities – Investor–Owned Utilities – Prevailing Wage
House 1/12/2021 1/12/2021 Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/17/2021 1:03 PM