Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - State Fire Marshal - Explosives License
Sponsored by
Delegates Charkoudian, Conaway, Moon, and Wilkins
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Fire Marshal to deny an application for a certain license or permit if the State Fire Marshal makes a finding that the explosives will be used for an inappropriate purpose; requiring the State Fire Marshal to notify the Maryland Joint Operations Center, instead of certain other entities, on issuance of a certain license or permit; specifying that a certain owner, operator, or contractor may use explosives only within time restrictions established by a certain political subdivision; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - State Fire Marshal - Explosives License
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Safety - State Fire Marshal - Explosives License
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Safety - State Fire Marshal - Explosives License
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/06/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/09/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 43A
Text - Third - Public Safety - State Fire Marshal - Explosives License
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 44
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 45
Senate 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/15/2020 7:09 PM