Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County Board of Education - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy MC 22-15
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation
Status
In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing for the conduct of a special election to fill a vacancy for an elected member on the Montgomery County Board of Education under specified circumstances; altering the authority of the members of the county board to appoint an individual to fill a vacancy for an elected member on the county board; providing that, under specified circumstances, the special election be held concurrently with a specified previously scheduled election in the county; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2015
Legislative Date
1/29/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2015
Legislative Date
1/30/2015
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {435761/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/14/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2015 1/29/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/30/2015 1/30/2015 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2015 3/12/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 Favorable with Amendments {435761/1 Report Adopted 43
House 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
House 3/17/2015 3/14/2015 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 44
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 45
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-901 )
(   8-401, 9-501 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM