Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Assembly - Live and Archived Video Streaming of Meetings
Sponsored by
Delegates Hough, Afzali, Arentz, Aumann, Bates, Eckardt, Frank, George, Glass, Haddaway-Riccio, Hogan, Jacobs, Kipke, Krebs, McComas, McDermott, McMillan, Myers, Norman, O'Donnell, Otto, Parrott, Schuh, Schulz, and Szeliga
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the General Assembly to make available to the public specified video streaming of specified meetings of the Senate of Maryland, the House of Delegates of Maryland, and specified standing committees.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 4:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2014
Legislative Date
2/20/2014
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/14/2014 1/15/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 2/24 at 4:00 p.m.
House 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/20/2014 2/20/2014 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-101, 2-1805 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM