Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Prohibition on Marking Flags - Repeal
Sponsored by
Delegates Bromwell, Aumann, Brooks, Cluster, Folden, Grammer, Hettleman, Hornberger, Lafferty, Luedtke, Metzgar, Miele, Morgan, Morhaim, West, and C. Wilson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 617
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a criminal prohibition on making specified markings on a flag authorized by the United States or this State for exhibition or display, publicly exhibiting a flag of the United States or this State that has specified markings, or displaying merchandise with a flag of the United States or this State to advertise, decorate, or mark the merchandise.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Special Order until 2/17 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
71
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 617
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2016 1/21/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/21/2016 1/21/2016 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/12/2016 2/15/2016 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 2/16/2016 2/16/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 25
House 2/16/2016 2/16/2016 Special Order until 2/17 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted 25
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Second Reading Passed 26
House 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 28
Senate 2/22/2016 2/22/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 28
Senate 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/06/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 61A
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Second Reading Passed 61A
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 67
House 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Returned Passed 71
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 617
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-703 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM