Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County – Alcoholic Beverages – Inspections, Food Sales Requirements, and Hours and Days of Sale MC 5–18
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 124
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing certain provisions of law requiring certain licensed premises in Montgomery County to be inspected at least monthly during the initial license year; requiring the Board of License Commissioners for Montgomery County to adopt regulations to require inspections of a premises for which the Board issues a license at least quarterly during the initial license year and periodically thereafter; exempting certain licensed premises from the inspection requirement; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {943590/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (118-2)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/10/2018
Legislative Date
4/10/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 124
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Food Sales Requirements and Hours and Days of Sale MC 5-18
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Favorable with Amendments {943590/1 Adopted 41
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
Text - Third - Montgomery County – Alcoholic Beverages – Inspections, Food Sales Requirements, and Hours and Days of Sale MC 5–18
House 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Third Reading Passed (118-2) 43
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 44
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 54
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 55
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 4/10/2018 4/10/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 124
Text - Chapter - Montgomery County – Alcoholic Beverages – Inspections, Food Sales Requirements, and Hours and Days of Sale MC 5–18
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   25-102, 25-1611, 25-2005, 25-902, 25-903, 25-906 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM