Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

HB0177


CH0097

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment – Water Infrastructure Assets – Authorization of Emergency Actions
Sponsored by
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 97
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Department of the Environment to take certain emergency actions to protect life, property, or the environment against risks arising from dams, reservoirs, and similar waterway constructions that are in imminent danger of failure; requiring the Department to remain in charge and control of a water infrastructure asset until the Department has determined that the water infrastructure asset has been rendered safe or the circumstances requiring the emergency actions have ceased; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {480110/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 97
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Appropriations
Text - First - Environment - Water Infrastructure Assets - Authorization of Emergency Actions and Establishment of Emergency Reserve
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable with Amendments {480110/1 Adopted 44
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Environment – Water Infrastructure Assets – Authorization of Emergency Actions
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 45
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Referred Rules 46
Senate 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable Adopted 52
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Second Reading Passed 52
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted 52A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 52A
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 52
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 97
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:09 PM