Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax – Real Property Tax Rate – Prohibition on Increase During Public Health Emergency
Sponsored by
Delegate Ivey
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City or the governing body of a county from increasing the county real property tax rate if the county is under a state of emergency declared by the Governor in order to protect the public health; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2021.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/01/2020
Legislative Date
10/01/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2021
Legislative Date
1/18/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
House 10/01/2020 10/01/2020 Pre-filed
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Property Tax – Real Property Tax Rate – Prohibition on Increase During Public Health Emergency
House 1/18/2021 1/18/2021 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/18/2021 9:35 AM