Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Reckless Driving, Speed Contests, Registration Plates, and Noise Abatement - Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegate Stewart
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from knowingly obscuring a registration plate for the purpose of evading automated enforcement of the Maryland Vehicle Law; providing a $500 fine for a violation of this section of the Act; increasing the assessments for certain motor vehicle violations related to reckless driving or participation in a race or speed contest to 12 points; establishing that a person charged with reckless driving or violations related to participation in a race or speed contest must appear in court and may not prepay the fine; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0408
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/29/2020
Legislative Date
10/29/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/29/2020 10/29/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Reckless Driving, Speed Contests, Registration Plates, and Noise Abatement - Penalties
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/20/2021 5:33 PM