Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Dangerous Dogs - Registration and Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegates Glenn and Haddaway-Riccio
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the owner of a dangerous dog to obtain a dangerous dog registration certificate from a local animal control unit within 10 days of a dog committing an act which renders it a dangerous dog; requiring the owner to pay a registration fee set by the animal control unit; requiring a dangerous dog registration certificate to include specified information; requiring a local animal control unit to issue a dangerous dog registration certificate if the dog's owner provides specified satisfactory evidence; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0169 Session: 2011 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/21/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2013 1/21/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/13/2013 2/18/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-619 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM