Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County Alcohol Modernization Act of 2018 MC 4-18
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 125
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a dispensary in Montgomery County to sell draft beer in refillable and nonrefillable containers and wine in refillable containers; repealing the prohibition in the county on issuing certain licenses for use in conjunction with or on the premises of a bowling alley, a billiard hall, or certain restaurants; altering the number of Board member votes required to issue a culinary school beer and wine license from a unanimous vote to a majority vote; altering hours of sale for certain licenses; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Montgomery County Alcohol Modernization Act of 2018 MC 4-18
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {253394/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Montgomery County Alcohol Modernization Act of 2018 MC 4-18
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (121-2)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {674338/1 Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-1)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Montgomery County Alcohol Modernization Act of 2018 MC 4-18
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/10/2018
Legislative Date
4/10/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 125
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Montgomery County Alcohol Modernization Act of 2018 MC 4-18
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Montgomery County Alcohol Modernization Act of 2018 MC 4-18
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Favorable with Amendments {253394/1 Adopted 41
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
Text - Third - Montgomery County Alcohol Modernization Act of 2018 MC 4-18
House 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Third Reading Passed (121-2) 43
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 44
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable with Amendments {674338/1 Adopted 54
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 55
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 57
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-1) 57
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Montgomery County Alcohol Modernization Act of 2018 MC 4-18
Post Passage 4/10/2018 4/10/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 125
Text - Chapter - Montgomery County Alcohol Modernization Act of 2018 MC 4-18
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   25-1004, 25-1008, 25-102, 25-1409, 25-1609, 25-1901, 25-1904, 25-2002, 25-2004, 25-2005, 25-2704, 25-2707, 25-2708, 25-2709, 25-310, 25-602, 25-605, 25-803, 25-902, 25-904 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM