Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority - Ocean City Convention Facility - Renovation
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Hartman, Anderton, Arentz, Chisholm, Ciliberti, Clark, Corderman, Cox, Jacobs, Kipke, Kittleman, Malone, Mautz, Metzgar, Otto, Saab, and Szeliga
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 217
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Maryland Stadium Authority to provide for the renovation of the Ocean City Convention facility; increasing, from $17,340,000 to $24,500,000, the amount the Board of Public Works may approve for the issuance of certain bonds related to the Ocean City Convention facility without receiving authorization by the General Assembly; altering certain contribution amounts, allocations of savings, and leasehold ownership allocations that must be contained in a certain lease or other written agreement with Ocean City; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0177
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0133 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
4/06/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 217
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Maryland Stadium Authority - Ocean City Convention Facility - Renovation
House 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2019 4/06/2019 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Stadium Authority - Ocean City Convention Facility - Renovation
House 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Referred Rules 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable Adopted 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Second Reading Passed 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/03/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Returned Passed 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 217
Text - Chapter - Maryland Stadium Authority - Ocean City Convention Facility - Renovation
(   10-628, 10-643 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page