Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Video Lottery Terminal Revenues - Purse Dedication Account - Standardbred Racetrack Operating Loss Assistance
Sponsored by
Delegates Turner, Atterbeary, Barve, Carozza, Ebersole, Hixson, C. Howard, Kaiser, Luedtke, A. Miller, Platt, A. Washington, and M. Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 227
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing for calendar years through 2019 the authorization to use specified Purse Dedication Account funds generated from video lottery proceeds for financial assistance for operating losses, in accordance with generally accepted accounting principles, by the Ocean Downs Race Course and Rosecroft Raceway to support a minimum of 40 live racing days at each race course.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0182
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2015
Legislative Date
1/29/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/09/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {275068/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-2)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 227
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2015 1/29/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/09/2015 2/09/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/19/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable with Amendments {275068/1 Report Adopted 46
House 3/19/2015 3/16/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
House 3/20/2015 3/18/2015 Third Reading Passed (137-2) 48
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation 47A
Senate 3/25/2015 3/25/2015 Hearing 3/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 4/02/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 56
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Second Reading Passed 56
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 57
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 227
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1A-27, 9-1A-28 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM