Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicles - Registration Cards - Digital or Electronic Images
Sponsored by
Delegates Tarlau, D. Barnes, Ebersole, Fennell, Hayes, Hornberger, Jalisi, Korman, Krimm, Lierman, Metzgar, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Reilly, Rey, Rosenberg, Sanchez, Shoemaker, Sophocleus, Walker, and A. Washington
Status
In the House - Referred to interim study by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration, on request, to issue and deliver to the owner of a motor vehicle at the time of registration a digital or electronic image of the registration card for the motor vehicle that contains specified information; authorizing an individual who is driving or in control of a motor vehicle to carry or display on the demand of a police officer a digital or electronic image of the registration card for the motor vehicle instead of the registration card; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Referred to interim study by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2016 1/21/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/03/2016 3/07/2016 Referred to interim study by Environment and Transportation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-408, 13-409 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM