Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Guidelines for Use of Electronic Control Devices
Sponsored by
Delegates Anderson, Barron, Atterbeary, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Branch, Bromwell, Brooks, Clippinger, Conaway, Dumais, Fennell, Folden, Fraser-Hidalgo, Glass, Glenn, Jackson, Kramer, Lam, Lierman, McCray, McIntosh, Moon, Morales, Oaks, Parrott, Proctor, Queen, Rosenberg, Sample-Hughes, Sydnor, Turner, Vallario, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, M. Washington, B. Wilson, and C. Wilson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission to include guidelines for the use of electronic control devices in a specified set of best practices and standards for use of force.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (116-22)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Guidelines for Use of Electronic Control Devices
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Guidelines for Use of Electronic Control Devices
House 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (116-22) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page