Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Housing - Community Development Administration - Residential Mortgage Loans
Sponsored by
Delegates Lafferty and Rosenberg
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 75
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Community Development Administration to make a residential mortgage loan for the refinancing of a residential mortgage loan under specified circumstances; requiring the Secretary of Housing and Community Development to determine the terms and qualifications for specified financial assistance to a homeowner under specified conditions; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2015
Legislative Date
1/29/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2015
Legislative Date
1/29/2015
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {400113/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/14/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 75
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2015 1/29/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 1/29/2015 1/29/2015 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Favorable with Amendments {400113/1 Report Adopted 40
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
House 3/12/2015 3/12/2015 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 42
Senate 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 42
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/26/2015 3/26/2015 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/26/2015 3/23/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 50
Senate 3/26/2015 3/23/2015 Second Reading Passed 50
Senate 3/27/2015 3/24/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51
House 3/30/2015 3/26/2015 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 4/14/2015 4/14/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 75
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-201, 4-235, 4-237, 4-238, 4-240, 6-201 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM