Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Carroll County - Local Government Tort Claims Act - Industrial Development Authority
Sponsored by
Carroll County Delegation
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of a "local government" under the Local Government Tort Claims Act to include the nonprofit corporation serving as the industrial development authority in Carroll County; providing that a specified notice requirement does not apply to specified actions against a specified nonprofit corporation in Carroll County or its employees; providing for the prospective application of the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0558
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {532212/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-1)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/14/2014 1/15/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/15/2014 1/15/2014 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2014 3/15/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Favorable with Amendments {532212/1 Report Adopted 48
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
House 3/17/2014 3/13/2014 Third Reading Passed (129-1) 49
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47
Senate 3/27/2014 3/28/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM