Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Smoking Marijuana in Vehicles - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegates Valentino-Smith, B. Wilson, Atterbeary, Barron, Beidle, Bromwell, Clippinger, Dumais, Folden, Fraser-Hidalgo, Hill, Jackson, Krimm, Lisanti, Patterson, Rosenberg, Smith, Sophocleus, Vallario, C. Wilson, and Kittleman
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a driver of a motor vehicle from smoking or consuming marijuana in the passenger area of the motor vehicle on a highway; prohibiting an occupant of a motor vehicle from smoking marijuana in the passenger area of the motor vehicle on a highway; and establishing specified penalties.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {732210/1
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Special Order until 2/17 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {732210/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Carozza) {753421/1
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Oaks) Adopted (89-44)
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Carozza) Rejected (54-78)
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2016 1/21/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/21/2016 1/21/2016 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/12/2016 2/15/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 2/16/2016 2/16/2016 Favorable with Amendments {732210/1 25
House 2/16/2016 2/16/2016 Special Order until 2/17 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 25
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Favorable with Amendments {732210/1 Report Adopted 26
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Carozza) {753421/1 26
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Motion vote previous question (Delegate Oaks) Adopted (89-44) 26
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Carozza) Rejected (54-78) 26
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 26
House 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 28
Senate 2/22/2016 2/22/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 28
Senate 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-201, 5-601.2 )
(   21-903 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM