Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Oyster Shell Recycling
Sponsored by
Delegates Lafferty, Beidle, Bromwell, Cardin, Haddaway-Riccio, Hershey, Holmes, Jacobs, Luedtke, McIntosh, Niemann, O'Donnell, Otto, S. Robinson, and Stein
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 279
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Allowing an individual or corporation a $1 credit against the State income tax for each bushel of oyster shells recycled during the taxable year; providing that the credit may not exceed $750 during a taxable year; requiring the Department of Natural Resources and the Comptroller jointly to adopt regulations to authorize businesses, landfills, and nonprofit organizations to verify the amount of oyster shells recycled by each individual or corporation; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0484
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/21/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {145767/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {309936/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Delegates Barve, Branch, and Afzali
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Senate Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Senators Colburn, Robey, and Madaleno
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 279
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2013 1/21/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2013 3/13/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Favorable with Amendments {145767/1 Report Adopted 47
House 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
House 3/19/2013 3/16/2013 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 49
Senate 3/20/2013 3/18/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation 49
Senate 3/27/2013 3/27/2013 Hearing 3/28 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 4/02/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Favorable with Amendments {309936/1 Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 61
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 65
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 House Requests Senate Recede 65
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Conference Committee Appointed 65
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Delegates Barve, Branch, and Afzali 65
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Senate Refuses to Recede 64
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Conference Committee Appointed 64
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Senators Colburn, Robey, and Madaleno 64
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Conference Committee Report Adopted 67
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Conference Committee Report Adopted 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 66
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Passed Enrolled 66
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 279
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-724.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM