Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Estate and Inheritance Taxes - Repeal
Sponsored by
Delegates Krebs, Afzali, Arentz, Aumann, Bates, Beitzel, Boteler, Cluster, Eckardt, Elliott, Fisher, Frank, George, Glass, Haddaway-Riccio, Hogan, Hough, Impallaria, Jacobs, Kipke, McComas, McDermott, McDonough, McMillan, W. Miller, Norman, O'Donnell, Otto, Parrott, Ready, Schuh, Schulz, Serafini, Smigiel, Stocksdale, Szeliga, and Wood
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the inheritance tax and the estate tax; and providing that the Act applies to decedents dying after December 31, 2013.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/14/2014 1/15/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/16/2014 1/16/2014 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
1/15/2014 Text - First - Estate and Inheritance Taxes - Repeal
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-201 through 7-204, 7-207 through 7-211, 7-214 through 7-221, 7-224, 7-225, 7-228, 7-231 through 7-234, 7-301 through 7-309 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM