Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George’s County Board of Education – Students With a Disability in Prince George’s County Public Schools – Report PG 506–18
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Prince George's County Board of Education to gather certain information about students with a disability in each public school in Prince George's County; requiring the county board to study certain matters regarding students with a disability in Prince George's County public schools; and requiring the county board to report its findings to the Prince George's County Delegation to the General Assembly on or before January 20, 2019.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Prince George’s County Board of Education – Students With a Disability in Prince George’s County Public Schools – Report PG 506–18
House 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page