Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Fees for Traffic and Criminal Convictions - Law Enforcement Training and Technology Fund
Sponsored by
Delegate McDermott
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Law Enforcement Training and Technology Fund; adding a $5 additional fee to the costs of traffic and criminal case convictions; requiring the Comptroller to distribute the additional fees collected into the Fund; establishing the purpose, administration, status, and composition of the Fund; requiring the Executive Director of the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to distribute money from the Fund to local law enforcement agencies annually in a specified manner; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/21/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2013
Legislative Date
1/22/2013
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2013 1/21/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/22/2013 1/22/2013 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/13/2013 2/18/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-401 through 4-404 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM