Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Uniform Real Property Transfer-on-Death (TOD) Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Carr, Cullison, Ebersole, Glass, C. Howard, Jalisi, Kramer, Krebs, Morales, Parrott, Smith, Sophocleus, Tarlau, Turner, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Uniform Real Property Transfer-on-Death (TOD) Act; authorizing an individual to transfer specified property to one or more beneficiaries effective at the transferor's death by a transfer-on-death deed; establishing that a transfer-on-death deed is revocable and nontestamentary; providing that the capacity required to make or revoke a transfer-on-death deed is the same as that required to make a will; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0101
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0059 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2015
Legislative Date
1/29/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2015 1/29/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/27/2015 3/03/2015 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-101 through 18-202 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM