Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Financial Institutions – Nondepository Special Fund – Expansion
Sponsored by
Chair, Economic Matters Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor, Licensing and Regulation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 479
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring certain revenue, fees, and examination and investigation fees and assessments relating to the licensure of collection agencies, consumer lenders, installment lenders, sales finance companies, mortgage lenders, check cashing services, and credit services businesses to be credited to the Nondepository Special Fund; stating the purpose of the Fund is to cover the direct and indirect costs of fulfilling the statutory and regulatory duties of the Commissioner and the State Collection Agency Licensing Board; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0006
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Financial Institutions – Nondepository Special Fund – Expansion
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {733894/1 Adopted
Proceedings
21
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
21
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Financial Institutions – Nondepository Special Fund – Expansion
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {867970/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Financial Institutions – Nondepository Special Fund – Expansion
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 479
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Financial Institutions – Nondepository Special Fund – Expansion
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Financial Institutions – Nondepository Special Fund – Expansion
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Favorable with Amendments {733894/1 Adopted 21
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 21
Text - Third - Financial Institutions – Nondepository Special Fund – Expansion
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 23
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Referred Finance 24
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Favorable with Amendments {867970/1 Adopted 55
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 57
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 64
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 64
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Financial Institutions – Nondepository Special Fund – Expansion
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 479
Text - Chapter - Financial Institutions – Nondepository Special Fund – Expansion
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-203.3, 11-402.1, 11-503.2, 11-610, 12-104.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM