Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Advance Directives - Witness Requirements, Advance Directives Services, and Fund
Sponsored by
Delegates Morhaim, Kipke, Lam, Oaks, K. Young, Krebs, Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, and Saab
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 667
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that a witness is not required for an electronic advance directive if the declarant's identity has been authenticated in accordance with specified replacement guidelines under specified circumstances; requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to issue a request for proposals from electronic advance directives services for a specified purpose; clarifying that the Department may contract with multiple electronic advance directives services; repealing a specified requirement; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {516286/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-4)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {367779/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-4)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 667
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health - Advance Directives - Witness Requirements, Advance Directives Services, and Fund
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Favorable with Amendments {516286/1 Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Health - Advance Directives - Witness Requirements, Advance Directives Services, and Fund
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Third Reading Passed (130-4) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Referred Finance 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments {367779/1 Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (134-4) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Public Health - Advance Directives - Witness Requirements, Advance Directives Services, and Fund
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 667
Text - Chapter - Public Health - Advance Directives - Witness Requirements, Advance Directives Services, and Fund
(   13-1401 through 13-1407, 5-601, 5-602, 5-620, 5-622, 5-623, 5-624, 5-626 )
(   6-103.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page