Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Mobile Laundry for the Homeless Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Delegate Qi
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Mobile Laundry for the Homeless Pilot Program in the Division of Neighborhood Revitalization to provide funds to nonprofit organizations to establish or expand mobile laundry services for the homeless; requiring the Division to award funds through certain grants to establish certain mobile laundry services; requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development to evaluate the effectiveness of the Pilot Program and make recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 15, 2024; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0746 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/19/2020
Legislative Date
8/19/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/04/2021
Legislative Date
1/04/2021
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Mobile Laundry for the Homeless Pilot Program
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 8/19/2020 8/19/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/04/2021 1/04/2021 Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Mobile Laundry for the Homeless Pilot Program
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/13/2021 4:02 PM